EP0066687 - Process for producing difficultly inflammable expandable styrene polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/50] | Finely divided expandable styrene polymers | ||
[1984/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEMISCHE WERKE HÜLS AG - RSP Patente / PB 15 - D-45764 Marl / DE | [1982/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rigler, Josef Karl, Dr. Helgolandstrasse 16 D-4350 Recklinghausen / DE | 02 /
Wienhöfer, Ekkehard, Dr. Griesheimer Strasse 12 D-4370 Marl / DE | 03 /
Leithäuser, Horst, Dr. Langehegge 151 D-4370 Marl / DE | 04 /
Trukenbrod, Karl, Dr. Leunaer Strasse 32 D-4370 Marl / DE | [1982/50] | Application number, filing date | 82102971.7 | 07.04.1982 | [1982/50] | Priority number, date | DE19813122342 | 05.06.1981 Original published format: DE 3122342 | [1982/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0066687 | Date: | 15.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0066687 | Date: | 08.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/20, C08K5/15, // (C08J9/20, C08L25:00) | [1982/50] | CPC: |
C08J9/20 (EP,US);
C08J9/0023 (EP,US);
C08J2325/00 (EP,US);
Y10S264/09 (EP,US);
Y10S264/15 (EP,US);
Y10S521/907 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1982/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von schwerentflammbaren expandierbaren Styrolpolymerisaten | [1984/32] | English: | Process for producing difficultly inflammable expandable styrene polymers | [1984/32] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication des polymères de styrène expansibles et difficilement inflammable | [1984/32] |
Former [1982/50] | Feinteilige expandierbare Styrolpolymerisate | ||
Former [1982/50] | Finely divided expandable styrene polymers | ||
Former [1982/50] | Polymères de styrène expansibles, finement divisés | Examination procedure | 04.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/07] | 14.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.01.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.04.1985 | SE | 08.04.1985 | BE | 30.04.1985 | [1991/51] |
Former [1988/13] | AT | 07.04.1985 | |
SE | 08.04.1985 | ||
Former [1987/20] | AT | 07.04.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2104867 (BASF AG); | [A]US4032481 (PILLAR WALTER O) |