EP0064604 - Precision lamp positioner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.07.1986 [1986/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PERKIN-ELMER CORPORATION 761 Main Avenue Norwalk Connecticut 06856-0181 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/46] | For all designated states THE PERKIN-ELMER CORPORATION 761 Main Avenue Norwalk Connecticut 06856-0181 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
La Fiandra, Carlo F. 725 Cheese Spring Road New Canaan Connecticut 06840 / US | [1982/46] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82102992.3 | 07.04.1982 | [1982/46] | Priority number, date | US19810262561 | 11.05.1981 Original published format: US 262561 | [1982/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0064604 | Date: | 17.11.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0064604 | Date: | 31.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G03B41/00, F21V19/04 | [1982/46] | CPC: |
G03F7/70058 (EP,US);
F21V19/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1982/46] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum präzisen Justieren einer Lampe | [1982/46] | English: | Precision lamp positioner | [1982/46] | French: | Dispositif pour positionner une lampe | [1982/46] | Examination procedure | 11.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/30] | 10.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1746014 (SCHWANHAUSSER WALTER E); | [Y]DE2412933 (GEHA WERKE GMBH); | [AD]USRE30315E ; | [A]US4011011 (HEMSTREET HAROLD S, et al) |