EP0063343 - Needleless injection apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1986 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.1986 [1986/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/43] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dettbarn, Hans-Jürgen Rehbocks Ecke 4 D-3550 Marburg/Lahn / DE | 02 /
Zimmermann, Josef Auf der Krautweide 11 D-6231 Sulzbach / DE | [1982/43] | Application number, filing date | 82103081.4 | 09.04.1982 | [1982/43] | Priority number, date | DE19813115377 | 16.04.1981 Original published format: DE 3115377 | [1982/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0063343 | Date: | 27.10.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0063343 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/30 | [1982/43] | CPC: |
A61M5/30 (EP,US);
A61M5/204 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1982/43] | Title | German: | Nadelloses Injektionsgerät | [1982/43] | English: | Needleless injection apparatus | [1982/43] | French: | Dispositif d'injection sans aiguille | [1982/43] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 18.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/13] | 09.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2653602 (SMOOT JOHN H); | [Y]US2296998 (KOEHLER ERNEST F); | [A]US3945379 (PRITZ HOWARD B, et al) |