EP0063750 - Process for the preparation of potassium tetrafluoro aluminate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.1987 [1987/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kali-Chemie Aktiengesellschaft Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 D-30173 Hannover / DE | [1982/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willenberg, Heinrich, Dr. rer. nat. Dipl.-Chem. Theodor-Storm-Strasse 2 D-3008 Garbsen 4 / DE | 02 /
Hellberg, Karl-Heinz, Dr. rer. nat. Dipl.-Chem. Am Papehof 21 D-3000 Hannover 91 / DE | 03 /
Zschiesche, Heinz Berliner Allee 68 D-3000 Hannover 1 / DE | [1982/44] | Representative(s) | Lauer, Dieter c/o Kali-Chemie Aktiengesellschaft Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/44] | Lauer, Dieter, Dr. c/o Kali-Chemie Aktiengesellschaft Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 D-30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 82103164.8 | 15.04.1982 | [1982/44] | Priority number, date | DE19813116469 | 25.04.1981 Original published format: DE 3116469 | [1982/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0063750 | Date: | 03.11.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0063750 | Date: | 19.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0063750 | Date: | 18.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C01F7/54 | [1982/44] | CPC: |
C01F7/54 (EP,US);
B23K35/3605 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1982/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Kaliumtetrafluoroaluminat | [1982/44] | English: | Process for the preparation of potassium tetrafluoro aluminate | [1982/44] | French: | Procédé de préparation du tétrafluoroaluminate de potassium | [1982/44] | Examination procedure | 24.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/44] | 02.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.12.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1985 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, 1947, Seiten 1172-1175, The Chemical Society, London, GB F.A. PAINE et al.: "Potassium Fluoaluminates" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 91, Nr. 13, 24. September 1979, Nr. 116548t, Columbus, Ohio, USA L. KOLDITZ et al.: "The reactions of dipotassium hexafluorosilicate with aluminum oxide" & Z. CHEM. 1979, 19(6), 229 | Examination | - "BROSSETT" ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR ANORGANISCHE CHEMIE 239 (1938), SEITEN 301/2 |