EP0064193 - 4,4'-Bis-(cyclohexyl)-biphenyl derivatives that contain fluorine, dielectrics containing them, and electro-optical indicator element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.1985 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1985 [1985/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 253 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/45] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Postfach, Frankfurter Strasse 250 D-64271 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eidenschink, Rudolf, Dr. Erlenweg 17 D-6110 Dieburg / DE | 02 /
Römer, Michael, Dr. Im Grossen Garten 18 D-6054 Rodgau 2 / DE | 03 /
Pohl, Ludwig, Dr. Niebergallweg 5 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | [1982/45] | Application number, filing date | 82103206.7 | 16.04.1982 | [1982/45] | Priority number, date | DE19813117152 | 30.04.1981 Original published format: DE 3117152 | [1982/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0064193 | Date: | 10.11.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0064193 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07C25/18, C07C43/192, C09K3/34, G02F1/13 | [1982/45] | CPC: |
C09K19/3003 (EP,US);
C07C15/12 (KR);
C07C15/14 (KR);
C07C17/093 (EP,US);
C07C25/18 (EP,US);
C09K2019/3021 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/093, C07C25/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1982/45] | Title | German: | Fluorhaltige 4,4'-Bis-(cyclohexyl)-biphenylderivate, diese enthaltende Dielektrika und elektrooptisches Anzeigeelement | [1982/45] | English: | 4,4'-Bis-(cyclohexyl)-biphenyl derivatives that contain fluorine, dielectrics containing them, and electro-optical indicator element | [1982/45] | French: | Dérivés du 4,4'-bis-(cyclohexyl)-biphényl)-biphényle contenant du fluor, diélectriques contenant ces dérivés et élément indicateur électro-optique | [1982/45] | Examination procedure | 10.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/20] | 26.09.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.10.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2636684 [ ] (MERCK PATENT GMBH); | EP0030761 [ ] (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) |