EP0091980 - Safety-cap bracket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lorenz Polygon-Ausbau GmbH Bovermannstrasse 15 D-4600 Dortmund / DE | [1983/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erdmann, Herbert Stockumer Heide 40 D-5810 Witten-Stockum / DE | [1983/43] | Representative(s) | Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, et al Schaeferstrasse 18 44623 Herne / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Schaeferstrasse 18 D-44623 Herne / DE | Application number, filing date | 82103303.2 | 20.04.1982 | [1983/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0091980 | Date: | 26.10.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0091980 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0091980 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | E21D11/34, E21D17/10 | [1983/43] | CPC: |
E21D11/34 (EP);
E21D17/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/43] | Title | German: | Sicherheitskappschuh | [1983/43] | English: | Safety-cap bracket | [1983/43] | French: | Sabot de chapeau de sécurité | [1983/43] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 16.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/17] | 10.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1987 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   21.07.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.10.1988 | FR | 05.10.1988 | GB | 05.10.1988 | IT | 05.10.1988 | NL | 05.10.1988 | SE | 05.10.1988 | AT | 20.04.1989 | CH | 30.04.1989 | LI | 30.04.1989 | LU | 30.04.1989 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/03] | BE | 05.10.1988 | |
GB | 05.10.1988 | ||
IT | 05.10.1988 | ||
NL | 05.10.1988 | ||
SE | 05.10.1988 | ||
AT | 20.04.1989 | ||
CH | 30.04.1989 | ||
LI | 30.04.1989 | ||
LU | 30.04.1989 | ||
Former [1999/52] | BE | 05.10.1988 | |
IT | 05.10.1988 | ||
NL | 05.10.1988 | ||
SE | 05.10.1988 | ||
AT | 20.04.1989 | ||
CH | 30.04.1989 | ||
LI | 30.04.1989 | ||
LU | 30.04.1989 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 05.10.1988 | |
IT | 05.10.1988 | ||
NL | 05.10.1988 | ||
SE | 05.10.1988 | ||
AT | 20.04.1989 | ||
CH | 30.04.1989 | ||
LI | 30.04.1989 | ||
Former [1990/52] | BE | 05.10.1988 | |
NL | 05.10.1988 | ||
SE | 05.10.1988 | ||
AT | 20.04.1989 | ||
CH | 30.04.1989 | ||
LI | 30.04.1989 | ||
Former [1990/17] | BE | 05.10.1988 | |
NL | 05.10.1988 | ||
SE | 05.10.1988 | ||
CH | 30.04.1989 | ||
LI | 30.04.1989 | ||
Former [1989/41] | BE | 05.10.1988 | |
NL | 05.10.1988 | ||
SE | 05.10.1988 | ||
Former [1989/35] | BE | 05.10.1988 | |
SE | 05.10.1988 | ||
Former [1989/24] | SE | 05.10.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2159996 ; | [X]GB1259182 ; | [A]FR2130162 (RHEINSTAHL AG); | [A]GB2005760 (CHARBONNAGES DE FRANCE); | [AD]DE2915782 (LORENZ POLYGON AUSBAU GMBH) |