Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
25.07.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.1984 [1984/39] |
23.03.1984 | Change - representative | published on 23.05.1984 [1984/21] |
19.05.1983 | Publication of search report | published on 20.07.1983 [1983/29] |
12.11.1982 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.01.1983 [1983/02] |