EP0069202 - Pulp press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salzgitter Maschinen und Anlagen Aktiengesellschaft Windmühlenbergstrasse 20-22 D-3320 Salzgitter 51 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/02] | For all designated states Salzgitter Maschinen und Anlagen Aktiengesellschaft Windmühlenbergstrasse 20-22 D-3320 Salzgitter 51 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Hans Neuroder Strasse 19 D-3381 Heimerode / DE | [1983/02] | Representative(s) | Kosel, Peter, et al Sobisch & Callies Odastrasse 4a 37581 Bad Gandersheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/02] | Kosel, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Inge. Röse, Kosel & Sobisch, Odastrasse 4a D-37581 Bad Gandersheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 82103351.1 | 21.04.1982 | [1983/02] | Priority number, date | DE19813125653 | 30.06.1981 Original published format: DE 3125653 | [1983/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0069202 | Date: | 12.01.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0069202 | Date: | 20.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B30B9/12, C13C3/00 | [1983/02] | CPC: |
B30B9/12 (EP);
B30B9/128 (EP);
B30B9/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/02] | Title | German: | Schnitzelpresse | [1983/02] | English: | Pulp press | [1983/02] | French: | Presse à pulpe | [1983/02] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 18.04.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1984/39] | 29.06.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.01.1984 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1984 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE963230 [ ] (WALTER SPIELVOGEL) |