EP0066706 - Semiconductor module circuit interconnection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.1987 [1987/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/50] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aug, Conrad Jean 513 Winona 6 N.W. Preston Minnesota 55965 / US | 02 /
Guenther, Charles Joseph 2605 25th St. N.W. Rochester Minnesota / US | 03 /
Randolph, James Bayliss 619 29th St. N.W. Rochester Minnesota 55901 / US | [1982/50] | Representative(s) | Colas, Alain Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/50] | Colas, Alain Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 82103544.1 | 27.04.1982 | [1982/50] | Priority number, date | US19810270427 | 04.06.1981 Original published format: US 270427 | [1982/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0066706 | Date: | 15.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0066706 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0066706 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/14, H05K3/40, H01L23/32, H01R9/09 | [1982/50] | CPC: |
H05K3/325 (EP,US);
H01L23/32 (EP,US);
H01L23/4006 (EP,US);
H05K3/365 (EP,US);
H01L2023/4043 (EP,US);
H01L2023/4062 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/09701 (EP,US);
H05K1/0393 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0367 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0373 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10393 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10719 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/50] | Title | German: | Leiterplatteanlage für Zusammenschaltung von Halbleitermodulen | [1982/50] | English: | Semiconductor module circuit interconnection system | [1982/50] | French: | Système de circuits imprimés pour l'interconnexion de modules semiconducteurs | [1982/50] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/26] | 12.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2331891 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]); | [A]US3701071 (LANDMAN DIRK); | [A]US3795037 (LUTTMER W); | [A]FR2031120 (BUNKER RAMO); | [A]US3723944 (GAUCHAT R, et al); | [A]DE2812631 (BUNKER RAMO) |