Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0093189 | Global Dossier | 13.08.1986 | B1 | EP0093189 | 09.11.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP82103867 | 05.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3272535D1 | 18.09.1986 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP82103867 | 05.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES266772Y | 16.11.1983 | Y | ES266772U | 16.05.1983 | U | Priority number | Date | EP82103867 | 05.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK4487 | 16.01.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | EP82103867 | 05.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR880000770B | 06.05.1988 | B1 | KR840000694 | 27.02.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | EP82103867 | 05.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4504022 | 12.03.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | EP82103867 | 05.05.1982 |