EP0065226 - Sulfenamides, process for their preparation, their utilisation as medicines and their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/47] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busse, Wolf-Dieter, Dr. Pahlkestrasse 65 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 02 /
Krauthausen, Edmund, Dr. Franz-Grillparzer-Ring 4 D-5000 Köln 71 / DE | 03 /
Mardin, Mithat, Dr. Bergerheide 39 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | [1982/47] | Application number, filing date | 82103911.2 | 06.05.1982 | [1982/47] | Priority number, date | DE19813118127 | 07.05.1981 Original published format: DE 3118127 | [1982/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0065226 | Date: | 24.11.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0065226 | Date: | 11.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/42, C07D249/14, C07D285/08, C07D285/12, C07D213/76, C07D231/52, C07D257/06, C07D279/06, C07D271/10, C07D271/06, C07D231/38 | [1982/47] | CPC: |
C07D207/456 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D209/34 (EP);
C07D209/36 (EP);
C07D213/76 (EP);
C07D225/02 (EP);
C07D231/08 (EP);
C07D231/38 (EP);
C07D231/52 (EP);
C07D231/56 (EP);
C07D233/52 (EP);
C07D233/88 (EP);
C07D239/42 (EP);
C07D241/20 (EP);
C07D249/04 (EP);
C07D249/14 (EP);
C07D253/04 (EP);
C07D253/07 (EP);
C07D257/06 (EP);
C07D261/14 (EP);
C07D261/20 (EP);
C07D263/18 (EP);
C07D271/07 (EP);
C07D271/08 (EP);
C07D271/113 (EP);
C07D275/03 (EP);
C07D275/04 (EP);
C07D277/18 (EP);
C07D279/06 (EP);
C07D285/08 (EP);
C07D285/135 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/47] | Title | German: | Neue Sulfenamide, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, ihre Verwendung in Arzneimitteln und deren Herstellung | [1982/47] | English: | Sulfenamides, process for their preparation, their utilisation as medicines and their preparation | [1982/47] | French: | Sulfénamides, procédé pour leur préparation, leur utilisation en médicaments et leur préparation | [1982/47] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 06.05.1982 | Examination requested [1982/47] | 04.12.1985 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB551207 (MANCHESTER OXIDE CO LTD, et al); | [A]GB557055 (MAY & BAKER LTD, et al); | [A]DE902010 (BAYER AG); | [A]DE1103761 (ADOX FOTOWERKE SCHLEUSSNER DR); | [X]DE2119711 ; | [X]US3770758 (KERWOOD J); | [X]DE2419017 (ICI LTD); | [A]EP0010616 (BASF AG [DE]) |