EP0065238 - Cluster for a boiling-water reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.1987 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.1987 [1987/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB ASEA-ATOM S-721 83 Västeras / SE | [1982/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borrman, Bo Rörverksgatan 16 S-72474 Västeras / SE | 02 /
Leine, Lars Malstensgatan 5 S-72353 Västeras / SE | 03 /
Nylund, Olof, Dipl.-Ing. Ragnaröksgatan 17 S-72017 Västeras / SE | 04 /
Ode, Bengt Löpargatan 80 S-72241 Västeras / SE | [1982/47] | Representative(s) | Boecker, Joachim Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/47] | Boecker, Joachim, Dr.-Ing. Adelonstrasse 58 D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 82103967.4 | 07.05.1982 | [1982/47] | Priority number, date | SE19810003057 | 15.05.1981 Original published format: SE 8103057 | [1982/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0065238 | Date: | 24.11.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0065238 | Date: | 04.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0065238 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/32, G21C1/22, G21C3/30 | [1983/18] | CPC: |
G21C3/32 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/18] | G21C3/32, G21C3/30, G21C3/30 | ||
Former IPC [1982/47] | G21C1/22, G21C3/30 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1982/47] | Title | German: | Brennelementbündel für einen Siedewasserreaktor | [1982/47] | English: | Cluster for a boiling-water reactor | [1982/47] | French: | Assemblage combustible pour un réacteur nucléaire à liquide bouillant | [1982/47] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/42] | 06.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2331352 (COMBUSTION ENG); | [Y]DE1806432 ; | [Y]DE2115406 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [Y]DE1464735 (KERNFORSCHUNG GMBH GES FUER); | [XD]US3389056 (ERLING FRISCH); | [YED]DE3148458 (ASEA ATOM AB [SE]) |