EP0065774 - Method for the recovery of pentaerythritol from the residual mixtures of the synthesis from acetaldehyde and formaldehyde [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.1986 [1986/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Montedison S.p.A. Patents & Licensing Dept. Foro Buonaparte, 31 P.O. Box 10528 I-20121 Milan / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | For all designated states Montedison S.p.A. Patents & Licensing Dept. Foro Buonaparte, 31 P.O. Box 10528 I-20121 Milan / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carazzolo, Gianalvise 10, via Firenze Castellanza(Varese) / IT | 02 /
Colombo, Giancarlo 4, V. le Col Di Lana Milano / IT | 03 /
Gavella, Giulio 17, via Banfi Imola (Bologna) / IT | 04 /
Giacomuzzo, Silvano 31/B Via Garibaldi Cassano Magnago(Varese) / IT | 05 /
Gianetti, Franco 65, via Varese Gallarate(Varese) / IT | [1982/48] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | Barz, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. V. Schmied-Kowarzik Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82104481.5 | 21.05.1982 | [1982/48] | Priority number, date | IT19810021891 | 22.05.1981 Original published format: IT 2189181 | [1982/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0065774 | Date: | 01.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0065774 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/38, C07C29/88, // C07C29/128, C07C31/24 | [1982/48] | CPC: |
C07C29/88 (EP,US);
C07C29/128 (EP,US);
C07C29/38 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/128, C07C31/245 (US,EP);
C07C29/38, C07C31/245 (US,EP);
C07C29/88, C07C31/245 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Rückgewinnung von Pentaerythrit aus rückständigen Mischungen seiner Herstellung aus Acetaldehyd und Formaldehyd | [1982/48] | English: | Method for the recovery of pentaerythritol from the residual mixtures of the synthesis from acetaldehyde and formaldehyde | [1982/48] | French: | Méthode de récupération du penta-érylthritol du mélange résiduel de sa synthèse à partir d'acétaldéhyde et de formaldéhyde | [1982/48] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 07.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/12] | 30.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1049841 ; | [A]US2407920 (COX RICHARD F B); | [A]GB824551 (ICI LTD); | [Y]US3076854 (KLEIN DAVID X); | [A]GB1025648 (FRITZ OTTO MEISSNER, et al); | [Y]DE2058519 (KOEI CHEMICAL CO); | [X]US4083931 (LEE FU-MING) |