EP0065777 - Flame-retardant resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.1987 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1987 [1987/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11 Minami Honmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11 Minami Honmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogawa, Yoshinari 4-11-5, Namiki Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Akagi, Noriyuki 7-9-19, Seishin Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Ikeda, Kenji 7-50-31, Higashioizumi Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Nakamura, Yoichi 2-29-20, Asahigaoka Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | [1982/48] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 82104496.3 | 22.05.1982 | [1982/48] | Priority number, date | JP19810078014 | 25.05.1981 Original published format: JP 7801481 | JP19820039364 | 15.03.1982 Original published format: JP 3936482 | [1982/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0065777 | Date: | 01.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0065777 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C08K9/06, C08L63/00 | [1986/30] | CPC: |
C08L67/00 (EP,US);
C08K9/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08K13/06 (EP,US);
C08L69/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K13/06, C08L67/00 (US,EP);
C08K9/06, C08L67/00 (EP,US);
C08K9/06, C08L69/00 (US,EP);
C08L67/00, C08L69/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [1982/48] | C08K9/06, C08L67/00, C08L69/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1982/48] | Title | German: | Flammhemmende Harzzusammensetzung | [1982/48] | English: | Flame-retardant resin composition | [1982/48] | French: | Composition ignifuge de résine | [1982/48] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 28.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/32] | 05.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4100075 (ASHMAN JOHN SLOCUM, et al) |