EP0065779 - Heating element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.1989 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.1989 [1989/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 4678530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mase, Syunzo 435, Aza-Motokinogo Ohaza-Tobishima-shinden Tobishima-Mura Ama-Gun Aichi Pref. / JP | 02 /
Soejima, Shigeo 25-70, Aza-Jiami Ohaza-Inokoshi Idaka-cho Meito-ku Nagoya-City / JP | [1982/48] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82104522.6 | 24.05.1982 | [1982/48] | Priority number, date | JP19810077920 | 25.05.1981 Original published format: JP 7792081 | [1982/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0065779 | Date: | 01.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0065779 | Date: | 22.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0065779 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/14, H01C7/04 | [1984/07] | CPC: |
H05B3/141 (EP,US);
H01C7/041 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/48] | H05B3/10, H01C7/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1982/48] | Title | German: | Heizelement | [1982/48] | English: | Heating element | [1982/48] | French: | Element de chauffage | [1982/48] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1983 | Examination requested [1983/36] | 02.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4111852 (HO SHIH M, et al); | [A]GB1346851 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [AE]US4333861 (AOKI MASAKI, et al); | [AP]EP0044981 (TAIYO YUDEN KK [JP]); | [AP]DE3107290 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]DE1465454 (ELOFOL AG); | [A]US3960778 (BOUCHARD ROBERT JOSEPH, et al) | Examination | GB1543900 |