Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.1989 [1989/31] |
02.07.1988 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.08.1988 [1988/33] |
27.04.1987 | Change - representative | published on 16.06.1987 [1987/25] |
30.04.1986 | First examination report | |
19.12.1983 | Publication of search report | published on 22.02.1984 [1984/08] |
12.12.1983 | Change - classification | published on 15.02.1984 [1984/07] |
04.07.1983 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.09.1983 [1983/36] |
01.10.1982 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.12.1982 [1982/48] |