EP0066789 - Transporting device for printing forms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1985 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.1985 [1985/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/50] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Back, Günter Rosenstrasse 33 D-6238 Hofheim 3 / DE | [1982/50] | Application number, filing date | 82104618.2 | 27.05.1982 | [1982/50] | Priority number, date | DE19813122321 | 05.06.1981 Original published format: DE 3122321 | [1982/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0066789 | Date: | 15.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0066789 | Date: | 04.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0066789 | Date: | 14.11.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G03F9/00, G03B27/50 | [1983/18] | CPC: |
G03F7/2014 (EP,US);
B65H2301/36112 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/50] | G03F9/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1982/50] | Title | German: | Einzugs- und Transportvorrichtung für Druckformen | [1982/50] | English: | Transporting device for printing forms | [1982/50] | French: | Dispositif pour le transport pour clichés | [1982/50] | Examination procedure | 18.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/30] | 11.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2844528 (GRETAG AG); | [Y]GB191327358 (WILLIAMSON KINEMATOGRAPH CO LT [GB], et al); | [Y]US2681618 (WARME CLARENCE H); | [A]FR1163747 (LEITZ ERNST GMBH); | [YD]DE2462216 (HOECHST AG) | Examination | EP0037065 |