EP0066262 - Method of making a metal end fitting for an electrical insulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.1985 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CERAVER Société anonyme dite: 12, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/49] | For all designated states CERAVER Société anonyme dite: 12, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaczerginski, Alexandre 7, rue Descartes F-03700 Bellerive sur Allier / FR | 02 /
Pargamin, Laurent 18, rue de la Source de l'Hopital F-03200 Vichy / FR | [1982/49] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/49] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 82104642.2 | 27.05.1982 | [1982/49] | Priority number, date | FR19810010772 | 01.06.1981 Original published format: FR 8110772 | [1982/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0066262 | Date: | 08.12.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H01B17/40 | [1982/49] | CPC: |
H01B17/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer End-Metallarmatur für einen elektrischen Isolator | [1982/49] | English: | Method of making a metal end fitting for an electrical insulator | [1982/49] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une ferrure d'extrémité d'isolateur électrique | [1982/49] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 30.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/32] | 01.12.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/28] | 30.01.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1985/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1984 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1233310 ; | [X]CH504085 ; | [X]CH152055 |