EP0066853 - Oxygen concentration detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.1987 [1987/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 4678530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/50] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mase, Syunzo 435, Aza-Motokinogo Ohaza-Tobishima-shinden Tobishima-Mura Ama-Gun Aichi Pref. / JP | 02 /
Soejima, Shigeo 25-70, Aza-Jiami Ohaza-Inokoshi Idaka-Cho Meito-ku Nagoya City / JP | [1982/50] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/50] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82104881.6 | 03.06.1982 | [1982/50] | Priority number, date | JP19810084968 | 04.06.1981 Original published format: JP 8496881 | [1982/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0066853 | Date: | 15.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0066853 | Date: | 31.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0066853 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/56 | [1982/50] | CPC: |
G01N27/409 (EP);
G01N27/417 (US);
G01N27/4065 (US);
G01N27/4067 (US);
G01N27/4073 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1982/50] | Title | German: | Sauerstoffkonzentrationsdetektor | [1982/50] | English: | Oxygen concentration detector | [1982/50] | French: | Détecteur de la concentration d'oxygène | [1982/50] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1983 | Examination requested [1983/36] | 31.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3028274 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]US4264425 (KIMURA SHINJI, et al); | [A]FR2051855 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]US3514377 (SPACIL HENRY S, et al); | [AP]EP0066227 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]); | [AP]EP0067326 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]); | [AP]EP0066228 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]); | [AP]EP0030164 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) |