EP0069239 - Propulsion device for transporting oblong half-products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.1986 [1986/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Dr. Friedrich Förster Prüfgerätebau GmbH & Co. KG In Laisen 70 72766 Reutlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/02] | For all designated states Institut Dr. Friedrich Förster Prüfgerätebau GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 925 In Laisen 70 D-72766 Reutlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Häberlein, Peter Oferdinger Strasse 23 D-7410 Reutlingen 24 / DE | [1983/02] | Application number, filing date | 82105049.9 | 09.06.1982 | [1983/02] | Priority number, date | DE19813126899 | 08.07.1981 Original published format: DE 3126899 | [1983/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0069239 | Date: | 12.01.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0069239 | Date: | 28.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0069239 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B65G49/00 | [1983/02] | CPC: |
G01N29/27 (EP);
B65G13/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [1983/02] | Title | German: | Antriebseinrichtung für die Fortbewegung von langgestrecktem Halbzeug | [1985/32] | English: | Propulsion device for transporting oblong half-products | [1983/02] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement pour le déplacement de demi-produits oblongs | [1983/02] |
Former [1983/02] | Antriebseinrichtung für die Fortbewegung von Langgestrecktem Halbzeug | Examination procedure | 07.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/46] | 13.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1773532 [ ]; | US3121325 [ ]; | US3327523 [ ]; | DE2645274 [ ]; | DE2021278 [ ] |