EP0066898 - Method and apparatus for treating hydrocarbon and halogenated hydrocarbon contaminated ground and ground water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 30.03.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GROUNDWATER DECONTAMINATION SYSTEMS, INC. 12 Industrial Park Waldwick New Jersey 07463 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/50] | For all designated states GROUNDWATER DECONTAMINATION SYSTEMS, INC. 12 Industrial Park Waldwick New Jersey 07463 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jhaveri, Vidyut 24D Timber Ridge Highland Mills New York 10930 / US | 02 /
Mazzacca, Alfred John 179 Orient Way Rutherford New Jersey 07070 / US | 03 /
Snyder, Harold 300 Winston Drive Cliffside Park New Jersey 07010 / US | [1982/50] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/50] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82105078.8 | 09.06.1982 | [1982/50] | Priority number, date | US19810281773 | 09.07.1981 Original published format: US 281773 | [1986/40] |
Former [1982/50] | deleted | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0066898 | Date: | 15.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0066898 | Date: | 01.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/02 | [1982/50] | CPC: |
B09C1/10 (EP,US);
C02F3/04 (EP,US);
C02F3/046 (EP,US);
C02F3/34 (EP,US);
Y02W10/10 (EP,US);
Y10S210/901 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von mit Kohlenwasserstoffen und halogenierten Kohlenwasserstoffen verseuchtem Boden oder Grundwasser | [1982/50] | English: | Method and apparatus for treating hydrocarbon and halogenated hydrocarbon contaminated ground and ground water | [1982/50] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le traitement de sol et des eaux souterraines contaminés d'hydrocarbures ou d'hydrocarbures halogénés | [1982/50] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/25] | 10.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.06.1987
07.01.1988
ADMISSIBLE Biodetox Gesellschaft zur biologischen Schadstoffentsorgung m.b.H. D-31708 Ahnsen / DE Opponent's representative Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.06.1987
07.01.1988
ADMISSIBLE Biodetox Gesellschaft zur biologischen Schadstoffentsorgung m.b.H. D-31708 Ahnsen / DE Opponent's representative UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | 08.01.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.09.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.10.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 17.12.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 01.12.1989 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.02.1990 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.02.1990 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 02.10.1992 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1994/20] | Appeal following opposition | 13.02.1990 | Appeal received No. T0129/90 | 26.02.1990 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.10.1992 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3721622 (TANNAHILL A, et al); | [YD]US3846290 (RAYMOND R); | [Y]GB1400256 (BANQUE POUR LEXPANSION IND) |