EP0071012 - Centrifuge screen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.1985 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1985 [1985/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sulzer - Escher Wyss AG Hardstrasse 319 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | [1983/17] |
Former [1983/06] | For all designated states Sulzer-Escher Wyss AG Hardstrasse 319 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spiewok, Leonhard Zielackerstrasse 19 CH-8304 Wallisellen / CH | [1983/06] | Representative(s) | Paschedag, Hansjoachim, et al c/o Sulzer - Escher Wyss AG Patentabteilung Postfach 8023 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1983/18] | Paschedag, Hansjoachim, et al c/o Sulzer - Escher Wyss AG Patentabteilung Postfach CH-8023 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1983/06] | Paschedag, Hansjoachim c/o Escher Wyss AG Patentabteilung Postfach CH-8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 82105275.0 | 16.06.1982 | [1983/06] | Priority number, date | CH19810004826 | 24.07.1981 Original published format: CH 482681 | [1983/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0071012 | Date: | 09.02.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0071012 | Date: | 28.11.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B04B7/16 | [1983/06] | CPC: |
B04B7/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1983/06] | Title | German: | Zentrifugensieb | [1983/06] | English: | Centrifuge screen | [1983/06] | French: | Tamis pour centrifugeuse | [1983/06] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1982 | Examination requested [1983/06] | 26.03.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3100746 (HOLOWATY MICHAEL O); | [AD]GB2001254 (ESCHER WYSS LTD) |