EP0069269 - Ectoparasiticidal spray formulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/02] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stendel, Wilhelm, Dr. In den Birken 55 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 02 /
Voege, Herbert, Dr. Martin-Buber-Strasse 41 D-5090 Leverkusen 3 / DE | [1983/02] | Application number, filing date | 82105418.6 | 21.06.1982 | [1983/02] | Priority number, date | DE19813125897 | 01.07.1981 Original published format: DE 3125897 | [1983/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0069269 | Date: | 12.01.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0069269 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0069269 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/02, // (A01N25/02, 57:24, 57:16, 53:00, 47:22) | [1986/34] | CPC: |
A01N25/02 (EP);
A01N25/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1983/02] | A01N25/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/02] | Title | German: | Ektoparasitizide Sprüh-Formulierungen | [1983/02] | English: | Ectoparasiticidal spray formulation | [1983/02] | French: | Formulation ectoparasiticide pour pulvérisation | [1983/02] | Examination procedure | 21.06.1982 | Examination requested [1983/02] | 05.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 20.08.1986 | [2002/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1542752 (JENAPHARM VEB); | [X]US4096262 (ANDREWS PETER, et al); | [X]GB2058569 (MONTEDISON SPA); | [XP]EP0045424 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [XP]EP0050335 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]); | [XP]EP0061208 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]) |