EP0068417 - Endoscope light source apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Optical Co., Ltd. 43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/01] | For all designated states OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO., LTD. 43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hosono, Saburo 231-1, Takahata Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | [1983/01] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/01] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 82105472.3 | 22.06.1982 | [1983/01] | Priority number, date | JP19810096874 | 23.06.1981 Original published format: JP 9687481 | JP19810096879 | 23.06.1981 Original published format: JP 9687981 | [1983/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0068417 | Date: | 05.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0068417 | Date: | 05.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F21V29/00, A61B1/06 | [1983/01] | CPC: |
A61B1/0669 (EP);
F21V29/60 (EP,US);
A61B1/128 (EP);
F21V25/04 (EP);
F21V25/12 (EP);
G02B6/0006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/01] | Title | German: | Lichtquelle für ein Endoskop | [1983/01] | English: | Endoscope light source apparatus | [1983/01] | French: | Source lumineuse pour endoscope | [1983/01] | Examination procedure | 30.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/11] | 13.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.06.1985 | BE | 05.06.1985 | CH | 05.06.1985 | FR | 05.06.1985 | IT | 05.06.1985 | LI | 05.06.1985 | NL | 05.06.1985 | SE | 05.06.1985 | [2003/06] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 05.06.1985 | |
BE | 05.06.1985 | ||
CH | 05.06.1985 | ||
FR | 05.06.1985 | ||
IT | 05.06.1985 | ||
LI | 05.06.1985 | ||
NL | 05.06.1985 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 05.06.1985 | |
BE | 05.06.1985 | ||
CH | 05.06.1985 | ||
IT | 05.06.1985 | ||
LI | 05.06.1985 | ||
NL | 05.06.1985 | ||
Former [1989/18] | AT | 05.06.1985 | |
BE | 05.06.1985 | ||
CH | 05.06.1985 | ||
LI | 05.06.1985 | ||
NL | 05.06.1985 | ||
Former [1988/04] | AT | 05.06.1985 | |
BE | 05.06.1985 | ||
NL | 05.06.1985 | ||
Former [1986/45] | AT | 05.06.1985 | |
NL | 05.06.1985 | ||
Former [1986/30] | NL | 05.06.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3638013 (KELLER RONALD F); | [A]GB1393699 (SPOT SHOT LTD); | [Y]DE2532946 (ORIGINAL HANAU QUARZLAMPEN) |