EP0071019 - 2,3-Dialkoxypropyl glyceryl ether and its preparation process as well as cosmetic composition containing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.1985 [1985/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO SOAP COMPANY, LTD. 1-14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/06] | For all designated states KAO SOAP COMPANY, LTD. 1-14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takaishi, Naotake 1022-24, Himuro-cho Utsunomiya-shi Tochigi-ken / JP | 02 /
Inamoto, Yoshiaki 970-63, Himuro-cho Utsunomiya-shi Tochigi-ken / JP | 03 /
Urata, Kouichi 2606-6, Ooaza Akabane Ichikai-machi Haga-gun Tochigi-ken / JP | 04 /
Kawano, Junichi 1-27-13, Nakashizu Sakura-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 05 /
Tsutsumi, Hisao 422-7, Ooaza-Kokunou Miyashiro-machi Minamisaitama-gun Saitama-ken / JP | [1983/06] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/06] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82105573.8 | 24.06.1982 | [1983/06] | Priority number, date | JP19810113404 | 20.07.1981 Original published format: JP 11340481 | [1983/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0071019 | Date: | 09.02.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0071019 | Date: | 30.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07C43/13, C07C41/28, C07D317/22, A61K7/00, B01F17/42 | [1983/06] | CPC: |
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
C07C29/149 (EP,US);
C07C31/125 (EP,US);
C07C43/135 (EP,US);
C07D303/22 (EP,US);
C07D317/22 (EP,US);
C07D407/12 (EP,US);
A61K2800/75 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C29/149, C07C31/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1983/06] | Title | German: | 2.3-Dialkoxypropylglyceryläther, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und diese enthaltende kosmetische Zusammensetzung | [1983/06] | English: | 2,3-Dialkoxypropyl glyceryl ether and its preparation process as well as cosmetic composition containing same | [1983/06] | French: | Ether 2.3-dialkoxypropyl du glycérol, procédé de préparation et composition cosmétique contenant ceux-ci | [1983/06] | Examination procedure | 19.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/27] | 17.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.11.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3398201 (GLICKMAN SAMUEL A); | [A]DE2136572 (BAYER AG); | [A]EP0025654 (KAO CORP [JP]) |