EP0073313 - A stitch bonded fabric for reinforcing coated abrasive backings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/10] | A stitch bonded fabrics for reinforcing coated abrasive backings | ||
[1986/51] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 30.11.1994 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street Worcester Massachusetts 01606 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/10] | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street Worcester Massachusetts 01606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Darjee, Dhiraj Harlbhaj 1 Summit Park Ballston Lake New York / US | [1983/10] | Representative(s) | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., et al Diehl & Partner GbR Postfach 34 01 15 80098 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., Dr., et al Diehl, Glaeser, Hiltl & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 D-80603 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/10] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82105651.2 | 25.06.1982 | [1983/10] | Priority number, date | US19810297538 | 31.08.1981 Original published format: US 297538 | [1983/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0073313 | Date: | 09.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0073313 | Date: | 28.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0073313 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | D04H3/10 | [1983/10] | CPC: |
D04H3/10 (EP);
D04B21/165 (EP);
D10B2403/02412 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1983/10] | Title | German: | Nähwirkstoff zur Verstärkung von mit Schleifmitteln überzogenen Unterlagen | [1983/10] | English: | A stitch bonded fabric for reinforcing coated abrasive backings | [1986/51] | French: | Tissu lié par couture pour renforcer des supports abrasifs enduits | [1983/10] |
Former [1983/10] | A stitch bonded fabrics for reinforcing coated abrasive backings | Examination procedure | 23.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/32] | 20.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.09.1987
13.11.1987
ADMISSIBLE Stora Feldmühle AG Patentabteilung Postfach 10 04 63 D-41704 Viersen / DE | 02
17.09.1987
22.01.1988
ADMISSIBLE Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US Opponent's representative Bowman, Paul Alan Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.09.1987
13.11.1987
ADMISSIBLE Stora Feldmühle AG Patentabteilung Postfach 10 04 63 D-41704 Viersen / DE | ||
02
17.09.1987
22.01.1988
ADMISSIBLE Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US Opponent's representative Bowman, Paul Alan LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R OAE / GB | |||
Former [1987/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.09.1987
Stora Feldmühle AG Patentabteilung Postfach 10 04 63 D-41704 Viersen / DE | ||
02
17.09.1987
Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US Opponent's representative von Puttkamer, Nikolaus, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Haft, von Puttkamer Berngruber, Czybulka Franziskanerstrasse 38 D-81669 München / DE | |||
Former [1987/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.09.1987
ADMISSIBLE Stora Feldmühle AG Patentabteilung Postfach 10 04 63 D-41704 Viersen / DE | 25.01.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.07.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.09.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.1989 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 12.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 12.03.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.09.1994 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/03] | Appeal following opposition | 13.05.1991 | Appeal received No. T0374/91 | 22.07.1991 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.11.1992 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M00) [1992/45] | 25.09.1994 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 29.09.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.10.1994 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1986 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.08.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1995/17] | CH | 17.12.1986 | |
LI | 17.12.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2228876 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) |