EP0069324 - Pump apparatus for very cold liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.1986 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.1986 [1986/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH Wilhelm-Johnen-Strasse D-52425 Jülich / DE | [1983/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heybutzki, Helmut, Ing. Kommstrasse 13 D-5170 Jülich / DE | 02 /
Krug, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Siemensstrasse 18 D-5170 Jülich / DE | 03 /
Seferiadis, Johann, Dipl.-Ing. Im Wiesengrund 4 D-5170 Jülich / DE | [1983/02] | Representative(s) | Paul, Dieter-Alfred Paul & Albrecht Patentanwälte PartG mbB Stresemannallee 4b 41460 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/02] | Paul, Dieter-Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Fichtestrasse 18 D-41464 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 82105738.7 | 29.06.1982 | [1983/02] | Priority number, date | DE19813126293 | 03.07.1981 Original published format: DE 3126293 | [1983/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0069324 | Date: | 12.01.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0069324 | Date: | 18.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0069324 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F04B15/08 | [1983/02] | CPC: |
F04B15/08 (EP,US);
F04D13/024 (EP,US);
F04D29/5893 (EP,US);
F04D7/02 (EP,US);
F24F8/117 (EP,US);
F24F2006/001 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, LI, NL [1983/02] | Title | German: | Pumpvorrichtung für sehr kalte Flüssigkeiten | [1983/02] | English: | Pump apparatus for very cold liquids | [1983/02] | French: | Dispositif de pompage à liquides à basse température | [1983/02] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 30.06.1983 | Examination requested [1983/36] | 15.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1653578 (PHILIPS NV); | [A]DE1143528 (UNION CARBIDE CORP); | [A]US3379132 (WAGNER RICHARD C); | [A]DE2731805 (CARPENTER TECHNOLOGY CORP); | [A]US3212280 (THOMAS EDMUND P, et al) |