EP0071745 - Composite video color signal generation from digital color signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.1989 [1989/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/07] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dean, Mark Edward 725 NW 4the Street Boynton Beach Florida 33435 / US | 02 /
Kummer, David Allen 18428 Alydar Way Boca Raton Florida 33434 / US | 03 /
Saenz, Jesus Andres 983 Ramblewood Drive Coral Springs Florida 33065 / US | [1983/07] | Representative(s) | Grant, Iain Murray IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/26] | Grant, Iain Murray IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1983/07] | Vekemans, André Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 82105769.2 | 29.06.1982 | [1983/07] | Priority number, date | US19810292074 | 12.08.1981 Original published format: US 292074 | [1983/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0071745 | Date: | 16.02.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0071745 | Date: | 12.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0071745 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H04N11/06, H04N9/64 | [1988/35] | CPC: |
G09G1/285 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/04] | H04N9/32, G09G1/28 | ||
Former IPC [1983/07] | H04N9/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/07] | Title | German: | Erzeugung eines FBAS-Signals aus digitalen Farbsignalen | [1983/07] | English: | Composite video color signal generation from digital color signals | [1983/07] | French: | Génération d'un signal vidéo en couleurs composite à partir de signaux en couleurs numériques | [1983/07] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.06.1983 | Examination requested [1983/35] | 20.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3939487 (LEVENTER WILLIAM) |