EP0069962 - Novel ester of 1,1-dioxopenicillanic acid, process for production thereof, and use thereof as beta-lactamase inhibitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1986 [1986/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEBO, LTD. 17-4 Sumida 5-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 131 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/03] | For all designated states KANEBO, LTD. 17-4 Sumida 5-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 131 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Shoji Venus Haitsu No. 605, No. 1 Mizuo 2-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Sakamoto, Fumio 12-32, Shiginonishi 5-chome Jyoto-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Tsukamoto, Goro 2-8, Toneyama 2-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Yamabe, Shigeru 2-7, Kamokagahara 1-chome Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1983/03] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/03] | Krause, Dieter Tillmannsweg 4 D-14109 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 82105996.1 | 05.07.1982 | [1983/03] | Priority number, date | JP19810109275 | 15.07.1981 Original published format: JP 10927581 | JP19810168605 | 23.10.1981 Original published format: JP 16860581 | [1983/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0069962 | Date: | 19.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0069962 | Date: | 02.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07D499/00, A61K31/43, // C07D317/40 | [1983/03] | CPC: |
C07D317/40 (EP,US);
C07D499/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/03] | Title | German: | 1,1-Dioxopenicillansäure-Ester, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und seine Verwendung als Beta-lactamase Hemmstoff | [1983/03] | English: | Novel ester of 1,1-dioxopenicillanic acid, process for production thereof, and use thereof as beta-lactamase inhibitor | [1983/03] | French: | Ester d'acide 1,1-dioxopénicillanique, procédé pour sa production et son application comme inhibiteur de bêta-lactamase | [1983/03] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/21] | 05.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1390754 (BEECHAM GROUP LTD); | [P]EP0039086 (KANEBO LTD [JP]) |