EP0069964 - Device for power distribution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 10.07.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2002 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): CH, LI | published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE INDUSTRIELLE DES TELECOMMUNICATIONS CIT-ALCATEL S.A. dite: 12, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/03] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE INDUSTRIELLE DES TELECOMMUNICATIONS CIT-ALCATEL S.A. dite: 12, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nouet, Christian 11, avenue Pierre Sémard F-91700 Sainte Genevieve des Bois / FR | [1983/03] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/03] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 82106000.1 | 06.07.1982 | [1983/03] | Priority number, date | FR19810013645 | 10.07.1981 Original published format: FR 8113645 | [1983/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0069964 | Date: | 19.01.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0069964 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H04M19/00, H02J9/06 | [1983/03] | CPC: |
H02J9/06 (EP,US);
H04M19/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/03] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Leistungsverteilung | [1983/03] | English: | Device for power distribution | [1983/03] | French: | Dispositif de distribution d'energie | [1983/03] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1983 | Examination requested [1983/35] | 25.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.1986
10.10.1986
ADMISSIBLE TELENORMA Telefonbau und Normalzeit GmbH Mainzer Landstrasse 128-146, Postfach 102160 6000 Frankfurt 1 / DE | [1988/07] |
Former [1986/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.1986
TELENORMA Telefonbau und Normalzeit GmbH Mainzer Landstrasse 128-146, Postfach 102160 6000 Frankfurt 1 / DE | 13.10.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.01.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.02.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 02.04.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 06.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 27.09.1989 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.12.1989 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.12.1989 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.12.1989 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.03.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 07.04.1991 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1991/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 06.07.1989 | SE | 07.07.1989 | BE | 31.07.1989 | CH | 31.07.1989 | LI | 31.07.1989 | NL | 01.02.1990 | DE | 03.04.1990 | FR | 29.03.1991 | [2002/40] |
Former [2002/02] | CH | 30.10.1985 | |
LI | 30.10.1985 | ||
GB | 06.07.1989 | ||
SE | 07.07.1989 | ||
BE | 31.07.1989 | ||
NL | 01.02.1990 | ||
DE | 03.04.1990 | ||
FR | 29.03.1991 | ||
Former [1992/01] | GB | 06.07.1989 | |
SE | 07.07.1989 | ||
BE | 31.07.1989 | ||
CH | 31.07.1989 | ||
LI | 31.07.1989 | ||
NL | 01.02.1990 | ||
DE | 03.04.1990 | ||
FR | 29.03.1991 | ||
Former [1991/20] | GB | 06.07.1989 | |
SE | 07.07.1989 | ||
BE | 31.07.1989 | ||
CH | 31.07.1989 | ||
LI | 31.07.1989 | ||
NL | 01.02.1990 | ||
DE | 03.04.1990 | ||
Former [1990/29] | GB | 06.07.1989 | |
SE | 07.07.1989 | ||
BE | 31.07.1989 | ||
CH | 31.07.1989 | ||
LI | 31.07.1989 | ||
NL | 01.02.1990 | ||
Former [1990/28] | GB | 06.07.1989 | |
SE | 07.07.1989 | ||
BE | 31.07.1989 | ||
CH | 31.07.1989 | ||
LI | 31.07.1989 | ||
Former [1990/26] | GB | 06.07.1989 | |
SE | 07.07.1989 | ||
BE | 31.07.1989 | ||
Former [1990/19] | SE | 07.07.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ERICSSON REVIEW, vol. 56, no. 2, 1979, pages 80-83, Stockholm (SE); | [ ] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE, vol. 31, 1977, pages 106-111, Oak Brook Illinois (USA); | Examination | - ERICSSON REVIEW, vol. 56, no. 2, 1979, pages 80-83, Stockholm (SE); B. VILKLUND et al.: "Power supply units in the M5 construction practice" | - Der Fernmeldeingenieur (26), Oktober 1972, Heft 10, p.36-37 | - Der Fernmeldeingenieur (27), 1973, Heft 2, p. 24-25 | - Jahrbuch des elektrischen Fernmeldewesens (22), 1971, p. 59-60 | - TN-Nachrichten 1965, Heft 65, p. 95-96 | - Hockley Oden, Nachrichtenvermittlung: Grundsätze und Systemmerkmale bei Fernsprech- und Datennetzen, R. Oldenbourg-Verlag GmbH, München, 1975 | - telcom-report 3 (1980), Heft 3, p. 197-202 | - Unterrichtsblätter der Deutschen Bundespost, Ausgabe B (27), 1974, No. 3, p. 69-74 |