EP0098325 - Optical arithmetical unit, device for converting residue numbers into positional notation numbers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/03] | Optical arithmetical unit, device for converting residue numbers into positional notation numbers and method of operating the device and the arithmetical unit | ||
[1989/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.1990 [1990/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/03] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuöcker, Dieter, Prof. Dr. Veitingergasse 30/5 A-1130 Wien / AT | 02 /
Klement, Ekkehard, Dr. Siegrunestrasse 1 D-8000 München 19 / DE | [1984/03] | Application number, filing date | 82106136.3 | 08.07.1982 | [1984/03] | Priority number, date | DE19813126987 | 08.07.1981 Original published format: DE 3126987 | DE19823225404 | 07.07.1982 Original published format: DE 3225404 | [1984/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0098325 | Date: | 18.01.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0098325 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0098325 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/72, G06F7/56, H03M7/18 | [1986/04] | CPC: |
H03M7/008 (EP);
G02F7/00 (EP);
G06E1/04 (EP);
G06E1/065 (EP);
H03M7/04 (EP);
H03M7/18 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/03] | G06F7/72, G06F7/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1984/03] | Title | German: | Optisches Rechenwerk, Vorrichtung zur Umwandlung von Residuenzahlen in positionsnotierte Zahlen | [1989/15] | English: | Optical arithmetical unit, device for converting residue numbers into positional notation numbers | [1989/15] | French: | Unité arithmétique optique, dispositif de conversion de nombres à résidus en nombres à notation positionnelle | [1989/15] |
Former [1984/03] | Optisches Rechenwerk, Vorrichtung zur Umwandlung von Residuenzahlen in positionsnotierte Zahlen und Verfahren zum Betrieb der Vorrichtung und des Rechenwerks | ||
Former [1984/03] | Optical arithmetical unit, device for converting residue numbers into positional notation numbers and method of operating the device and the arithmetical unit | ||
Former [1984/03] | Unité arithmétique optique, dispositif de conversion de nombres à résidus en nombres à notation positionnelle et procédé de fonctionnement du dispositif et de l'unité arithmétique | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Miscellaneous | EPB 1989/15: Teilanmeldung 88110312 eingereicht am 28.06.88 | Examination procedure | 12.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 10.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP88110312.1 / EP0305677 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/13] | Request for further processing for: | 22.08.1986 | Request for further processing filed | 25.08.1986 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.09.1986 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3990072 (BIEGELSEN DAVID K) | [AD] - APPLIED OPTICS, Band 18, Nr. 2, Januar 1979, Seiten 149-162, New York, US; A. HUANG et al.: "Optical computation using residue arithmetic" |