EP0098895 - Rigid diaphragm transducer with plural coils [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.1985 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.1985 [1985/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Necoechea, Robert Warren 386 Lynn Avenue Milpitas, California / US | [1984/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/04] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/04] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82106425.0 | 16.07.1982 | [1984/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0098895 | Date: | 25.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H04R9/06, H04R9/04, H04R7/14 | [1984/04] | CPC: |
H04R9/04 (EP,US);
H04R7/045 (EP,US);
H04R7/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/04] | Title | German: | Wandler mit starrer Membran und mehreren Spulen | [1984/04] | English: | Rigid diaphragm transducer with plural coils | [1984/04] | French: | Transducteur à diaphragme rigide avec plusieurs bobines | [1984/04] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 26.09.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/15] | 22.10.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1985/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1045807 (WOLFGANG FELIX EWALD); | [A]US3873784 (DOSCHEK ANTONY Z); | [AD]US1934184 (ERWIN GERLACH, et al) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 19, no. 10, March 1977, page 3857New York (USA); |