EP0071184 - Hose clamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1985 [1985/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allert, Kurt Panoramaweg 3 D-7238 Oberndorf/Neckar / DE | [1983/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/06] | Representative(s) | König, Oskar Klüpfelstrasse 6 Postfach 10 27 33 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/06] | König, Oskar, Dr.-Ing. Dipl.-Phys. Klüpfelstrasse 6 Postfach 10 27 33 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 82106606.5 | 22.07.1982 | [1983/06] | Priority number, date | DE19813130007 | 30.07.1981 Original published format: DE 3130007 | [1983/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0071184 | Date: | 09.02.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0071184 | Date: | 27.12.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/08 | [1983/06] | CPC: |
F16L33/08 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1427 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1441 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1983/06] | Title | German: | Schlauchschelle | [1983/06] | English: | Hose clamp | [1983/06] | French: | Collier de serrage pour tuyaux souples | [1983/06] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/27] | 08.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7217340U ; | [A]CH408567 (HENNING WOLFGANG [DE]); | [A]FR1484749 (CAILLAU ETS); | [A]DE1261717 (HENNING WOLFGANG); | [A]DE1983858U (BERNER ALBERT FA [DE]); | [A]DE6802622U (BERNER ALBERT FA [DE]) |