EP0071205 - Method for forming high density dielectric isolation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.1990 [1990/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/06] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chu, Wei-Kan Wayne Drive Poughkeepsie New York 12601 / US | 02 /
Pliskin, William Aaron Greenvale Farms Road Poughkeepsie New York 12603 / US | 03 /
Riseman, Jacob Barnard Avenue Poughkeepsie New York 12601 / US | [1983/06] | Representative(s) | Kreidler, Eva-Maria, et al Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/16] | Kreidler, Eva-Maria, Dr. rer. nat., et al Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | ||
Former [1989/11] | Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1983/06] | Kreidler, Eva-Maria, Dr. rer. nat. Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 82106656.0 | 23.07.1982 | [1983/06] | Priority number, date | US19810287466 | 27.07.1981 Original published format: US 287466 | [1983/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0071205 | Date: | 09.02.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0071205 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0071205 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/76, H01L21/316 | [1983/06] | CPC: |
H01L21/02126 (EP,US);
H01L21/02282 (EP,US);
H01L21/02304 (EP,US);
H01L21/31051 (EP,US);
H01L21/31604 (US);
H01L21/31608 (US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer dielektrischen Isolation hoher Dichtheit | [1983/06] | English: | Method for forming high density dielectric isolation | [1983/06] | French: | Procédé pour la formation d'une isolation diélectrique à haute densité | [1983/06] | Examination procedure | 19.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/31] | 15.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JP57012533 ; | [X]EP0011418 (GEN ELECTRIC CO LTD [GB]); | [YD]US3212929 (PLISKIN WILLIAM A, et al); | [XP]EP0041776 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [E]EP0060205 (FAIRCHILD CAMERA INSTR CO [US]) | [X] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 8, no. 4, September 1965, pages 670-671, New York, US; W.A. PIECZONKA et al.: "Isolation method and structure for integrated devices" | [AD] - ELECTROCHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY, vol. 2, no. 7-8, July-August 1964, pages 196-200, Princeton, GB; W.A. PLISKIN et al.: "Techniques for obtaining uniform thin glass films on substrates" | [AD] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 20, no. 1, June 1977, New York, US; S.A. ABBAS: "Recessed oxide isolation process" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 23, no. 10, March 1981, New York, US; R.F. LEVER et al.: "Trench refill with chemical vapor deposition mixed glasses" | [XP] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 72 (E-105) [950], 7th May 1982; & JP-A-57 012 533 (FUJITSU K.K.) 22-01-1982, & JP57012533 A 00000000 |