EP0077888 - Method and device for manufacturing microfiche masks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.1986 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.1986 [1986/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 83292 Traunreut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/18] | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 D-83292 Traunreut / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Michel, Dieter, Ing. grad. Langauenstrasse 12 D-8220 Traunstein / DE | [1983/18] | Application number, filing date | 82107082.8 | 05.08.1982 | [1983/18] | Priority number, date | DE19813142025 | 23.10.1981 Original published format: DE 3142025 | [1983/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0077888 | Date: | 04.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0077888 | Date: | 24.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0077888 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G03B27/32 | [1983/18] | CPC: |
G03B27/326 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung von Belichtungsmasken für die Herstellung eines Aufzeichnungsträgers mit einer Aufzeichnung hoher Informationsdichte | [1983/18] | English: | Method and device for manufacturing microfiche masks | [1983/18] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la production des masques pour microfiches | [1983/18] | Examination procedure | 11.08.1982 | Examination requested [1983/18] | 07.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.03.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3472587 [ ] (LIGUORI STEPHEN A); | US3620623 [ ] (REAMS ROBERT B JR, et al); | US3704946 [ ] (BRAULT ANDRE R, et al); | DE2817400 [ ] (THOMSON CSF); | US4160263 [ ] (CHRISTY HAROLD, et al) |