EP0072950 - Method of vaporising and combusting liquid fuels, and burner therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LOI Industrieofenanlagen GmbH Moltkeplatz 1 D-4300 Essen 1 / DE | [1985/45] |
Former [1983/09] | For all designated states KRAFT HAUSHERR GmbH & Co. KG Wuppertaler Strasse 79 D-4322 Sprockhövel 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ricke, Hans-Benno, Dr. rer. nat. Dipl.-Phys. Franziskusstrasse 18 D-8759 Hösbach / DE | [1983/09] | Representative(s) | Spalthoff, Adolf Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. A. Spalthoff, Dipl.-Ing. K. Lelgemann, Postfach 34 02 20 45074 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/09] | Spalthoff, Adolf, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. A. Spalthoff, Dipl.-Ing. K. Lelgemann, Postfach 34 02 20 D-45074 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 82107104.0 | 06.08.1982 | [1983/09] | Priority number, date | DE19813132948 | 20.08.1981 Original published format: DE 3132948 | [1983/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0072950 | Date: | 02.03.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0072950 | Date: | 24.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F23D11/24, F23D11/10, F23D11/38, F23D11/40 | [1983/09] | CPC: |
F23D11/007 (EP);
F23D11/38 (EP);
F23D11/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verdampfung und Verbrennung flüssiger Brennstoffe sowie Brenner hierzu | [1983/09] | English: | Method of vaporising and combusting liquid fuels, and burner therefor | [1983/09] | French: | Procédé de vaporisation et de combustion des combustibles liquides et brûleur pour ce procédé | [1983/09] | File destroyed: | 06.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 20.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/18] | 12.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 12.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 18.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1451383 ; | [A]DE1917387 ; | [AD]DE1551638 ; | [A]GB1016333 ; | [AD]DE2656439 ; | [A]GB539877 ; | [A]DE659695 ; | [A]DE1087310 ; | [A]GB1065760 ; | [A]FR2324986 ; | [A]DE2810193 ; | [AP]DE3011249 ; | [A]EP0018602 ; | [A]DE2839280 ; | [A]CH466484 ; | [A]DE7919481U |