blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0077890

EP0077890 - Electric chain hoist [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.11.1986
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.1999Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 29.12.1999 [1999/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
R. Stahl GmbH & Co. Elektrozugwerk
D-7118 Künzelsau / DE
[1983/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Rapp, Rudolf, Ing.(grad.)
Haus nr. 40
D-7118 Künzelsau-Kemmeten / DE
02 / Hornikel, Eugen, Ing.(grad.)
Am Hohenberg 10
D-7118 Künzelsau / DE
03 / Stiegler, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing.
Südstrasse 167
D-7118 Künzelsau-Kocherstetten / DE
[1983/18]
Representative(s)Rüger, Rudolf
Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel
Postfach 348
73704 Esslingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1983/18]Rüger, Rudolf, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Postfach 348
D-73704 Esslingen / DE
Application number, filing date82107167.707.08.1982
[1983/18]
Priority number, dateDE1981314247327.10.1981         Original published format: DE 3142473
[1983/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0077890
Date:04.05.1983
Language:DE
[1983/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0077890
Date:22.06.1983
Language:DE
[1983/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0077890
Date:29.01.1986
Language:DE
[1986/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.1983
ClassificationIPC:B66D3/22
[1983/18]
CPC:
B66D3/22 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1983/18]
TitleGerman:Elektrokettenzug[1983/18]
English:Electric chain hoist[1983/18]
French:Palan électrique à chaîne[1983/18]
Examination procedure20.07.1983Examination requested  [1983/39]
03.08.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
14.05.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
19.07.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.1985Fee for grant paid
06.08.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.10.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1987/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU31.08.1986
[1999/52]
Documents cited:Search[A]FR657252  ;
 [A]US2022049  (LESH LAURENCE J);
 [X]GB741063  (DEMAG ZUG GMBH);
 [A]GB751023  (COLUMBUS MCKINNON CHAIN CORP);
 [A]US2969954  (PARKER HUMPHREY F, et al);
 [AD]DE1209711  (DEMAG ZUG GMBH);
 [A]US3362685  (NOYE PAUL R, et al);
 [A]FR92370E  (BIRFIELD ENG LTD);
 [A]US3971971  (WYCOFF DAVID C);
 [AD]DE2714452  (HITACHI LTD)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.