EP0072957 - Improved bilirubin test kit and method for determining bilirubin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.1985 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILES LABORATORIES, INC. 1127 Myrtle Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/09] | For all designated states MILES LABORATORIES, INC. 1127 Myrtle Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rupchock, Patricia A. 3404 E. Lane 3A Elkhart, IN 46514 / US | 02 /
Skjold, Christopher A. 1602 Victoria Drive Elkhart, IN 46514 / US | [1983/09] | Representative(s) | Senftl, Hannes, et al c/o Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patentabteilung D-5090 Leverkusen Bayerwerk / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/09] | Senftl, Hannes, Dr., et al c/o Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patentabteilung D-5090 Leverkusen Bayerwerk / DE | Application number, filing date | 82107175.0 | 09.08.1982 | [1983/09] | Priority number, date | US19810294570 | 20.08.1981 Original published format: US 294570 | [1983/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0072957 | Date: | 02.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0072957 | Date: | 27.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/52, G01N33/72 | [1983/09] | CPC: |
G01N33/728 (EP,US);
Y10S436/903 (EP,US);
Y10T436/146666 (EP,US);
Y10T436/255 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/09] | Title | German: | Testsatz und Verfahren zur Bestimmung von Bilirubin | [1983/09] | English: | Improved bilirubin test kit and method for determining bilirubin | [1983/09] | French: | Trousse de réactifs et méthode pour la détermination de la bilirubine | [1983/09] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 09.08.1982 | Examination requested [1983/09] | 25.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.1985 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1985/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US2854317 (FREE ALFRED H, et al); | [Y]US3912457 (OGAWA YASUNAO, et al); | [A]GB2030291 (MILES LAB) |