blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0072020

EP0072020 - Open condenser [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  29.05.1987
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 31.10.2007  [2007/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomas, Karl-Wilhelm
Emsweg 7
D-41540 Dormagen / DE
[1983/07]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1983/07]
Representative(s)Paul, Dieter-Alfred
Paul & Albrecht
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Stresemannallee 4b
41460 Neuss / DE
[N/P]
Former [1983/07]Paul, Dieter-Alfred, Dipl.-Ing.
Fichtestrasse 18
D-41464 Neuss / DE
Application number, filing date82107213.910.08.1982
[1983/07]
Priority number, dateDE1981313178512.08.1981         Original published format: DE 3131785
[1983/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0072020
Date:16.02.1983
Language:DE
[1983/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0072020
Date:16.01.1985
Language:DE
[1985/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.1982
ClassificationIPC:F28B3/06
[1983/07]
CPC:
F28B3/06 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1983/07]
TitleGerman:Offener Kondensator[1983/07]
English:Open condenser[1983/07]
French:Condenseur ouvert[1983/07]
Examination procedure11.08.1983Examination requested  [1983/42]
13.10.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
23.03.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
03.07.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.1984Fee for grant paid
13.09.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.10.1985  08.11.1985  ADMISSIBLE
Stolco Stoltenberg-Lerche & Co. KG
Steinstrasse 16-18
D-40212 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1985/52]
Opponent(s)01  16.10.1985  08.11.1985  ADMISSIBLE
Stolco Stoltenberg-Lerche & Co. KG
Steinstrasse 16-18
D-40212 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte
Postfach 33 02 29
D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE
30.12.1985Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.05.1986Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.06.1986Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
22.12.1986Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
18.02.1987Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
01.03.1987Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1987/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT16.01.1985
[2007/44]
Former [1999/42]IT16.01.1985
Documents cited:Search[X]DE1451129  (BROWN BOVERI KRUPP REAKTOR);
 [XD]DE2439562  (BAYER AG);
 [A]DE2511763  (MUELLER RUEDIGER E DIPL ING);
 [A]DE2102744  (FRITZ VOLTZ SOHN);
 [A]DE711432  (KARL MEIENBERG);
 [A]FR2238134  (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.