EP0075693 - Selector for a gearbox [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 09.03.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WABCO Westinghouse Fahrzeugbremsen GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/14] | For all designated states WABCO Westinghouse Fahrzeugbremsen GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 D-30453 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reinecke, Erich Kastanieneck 6 D-3167 Burgdorf / DE | [1983/14] | Representative(s) | Schrödter, Manfred WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 62 30432 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/14] | Schrödter, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. WABCO Westinghouse Fahrzeugbremsen GmbH Postfach 91 12 80 D-30432 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 82107274.1 | 11.08.1982 | [1983/14] | Priority number, date | DE19813138827 | 30.09.1981 Original published format: DE 3138827 | [1983/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0075693 | Date: | 06.04.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0075693 | Date: | 02.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/14] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0075693 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B60K20/02 | [1983/14] | CPC: |
F16H59/044 (EP,US);
G05G2009/04755 (EP,US);
Y10S116/20 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20159 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20201 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20612 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1983/14] | Title | German: | Gangwähler für ein Getriebe | [1983/14] | English: | Selector for a gearbox | [1983/14] | French: | Sélecteur pour une boîte de vitesses | [1983/14] | Examination procedure | 27.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/14] | 19.06.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.12.1986
24.02.1987
ADMISSIBLE SWF Auto-Electric GmbH Stuttgarter Strasse 119 Postfach 1763 D-74307 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.12.1986
24.02.1987
ADMISSIBLE SWF Auto-Electric GmbH Stuttgarter Strasse 119 Postfach 1763 D-74307 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 24.02.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.07.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.08.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 23.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 07.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 19.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 17.07.1990 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.07.1990 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.07.1990 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.07.1990 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.11.1990 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.01.1991 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 24.06.1989 | Appeal received No. T0405/89 | 12.09.1989 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.07.1990 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE693042 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN); | [A]DE1188166 (CONTINENTAL ELEKTRO IND AG); | [A]DE1954721 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [AD]DE2343711 (FORD WERKE AG); | [A]DE2502578 ; | [A]DE2646393 |