EP0072971 - Process for producing zeolite agglomerates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kali-Chemie Aktiengesellschaft Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 D-30173 Hannover / DE | [1983/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Derleth, Helmut Dipl.-Chem., Dr.rer.nat. Grosse Drakenburger Strasse 58 D-3070 Nienburg / DE | 02 /
Sauer, Günther Prinzenstrasse 51 D-3070 Nienburg / DE | [1985/07] |
Former [1983/09] | 01 /
Derleth, Helmut Dr.-Chem., Dr.rer.nat. Grosse Drakenburger Strasse 58 D-3070 Nienburg / DE | ||
02 /
Sauer, Günther Prinzenstrasse 51 D-3070 Nienburg / DE | Representative(s) | Lauer, Dieter c/o Kali-Chemie Aktiengesellschaft Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/09] | Lauer, Dieter, Dr. c/o Kali-Chemie Aktiengesellschaft Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 D-30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 82107276.6 | 11.08.1982 | [1983/09] | Priority number, date | DE19813133317 | 22.08.1981 Original published format: DE 3133317 | [1983/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0072971 | Date: | 02.03.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0072971 | Date: | 10.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0072971 | Date: | 13.02.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/28, B01J2/28 | [1983/09] | CPC: |
C11D3/128 (EP);
B01J20/183 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Zeolith-Agglomeraten | [1983/09] | English: | Process for producing zeolite agglomerates | [1983/09] | French: | Procédé pour la production d'agglomérates de zéolithe | [1983/09] | Examination procedure | 12.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/38] | 01.06.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2423895 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK); | [A]US3912713 (BOONSTRA DOUWE JOHANNES, et al); | [YD]DE2736903 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO); | [Y]US4260528 (FOX DANIEL J, et al) |