EP0075695 - Bidimensinal high-density image sensor with photoconductor layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1987 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1987 [1987/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/14] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herbst, Heiner, Dr. Anechostrasse 29a D-8000 München 82 / DE | [1983/14] | Application number, filing date | 82107299.8 | 11.08.1982 | [1983/14] | Priority number, date | DE19813138314 | 25.09.1981 Original published format: DE 3138314 | [1983/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0075695 | Date: | 06.04.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0075695 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0075695 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/14, H04N3/15 | [1983/14] | CPC: |
H01L27/14665 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/14] | Title | German: | Zweidimensionaler Halbleiter-Bildsensor hoher Packungsdichte mit Fotoleiterschicht | [1983/14] | English: | Bidimensinal high-density image sensor with photoconductor layer | [1983/14] | French: | Capteur d'images bidimensionnel à couche photoconductrice et à haute densité | [1983/14] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/10] | 13.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.05.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2319182 ; | [A]FR2134042 | [YD] - INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING, 3.-5. Dezember 1979, Washington, D.C., Seiten 134-136, IEEE, Washington, US; T. TSUKADA u.a.: "New solid-state image pickup devices using photosensitive chalcogenide glass film" |