EP0073413 - Acylphosphine oxide compounds and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.1985 [1985/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/10] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henne, Andreas, Dr. Bruesseler Ring 34 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Hesse, Anton, Dr. Peter-Nickel-Strasse 15 D-6940 Weinheim / DE | 03 /
Jacobi, Manfred, Dr. Heidelberger Ring 32 B D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | 04 /
Schornick, Gunnar, Dr. Konrad-Adenauer-Strasse 8 D-6719 Neuleiningen / DE | 05 /
Vyvial, Rudolf Alwin-Mittasch-Platz 11 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
Holoch, Klaus, Dr. Virchowstrasse 4 D-6712 Bobenheim-Roxheim / DE | [1983/10] | Application number, filing date | 82107509.0 | 18.08.1982 | [1983/10] | Priority number, date | DE19813133419 | 24.08.1981 Original published format: DE 3133419 | [1983/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0073413 | Date: | 09.03.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0073413 | Date: | 06.04.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0073413 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/53, C08F2/50, C08K5/53, G03C1/68, G03F1/02 | [1983/10] | CPC: |
G03F7/029 (EP,US);
C07F9/5337 (EP,US);
C08F2/50 (EP,US);
C08K5/5397 (EP,US);
Y10S430/124 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/10] | Title | German: | Acylphosphinoxidverbindungen und ihre Verwendung | [1983/10] | English: | Acylphosphine oxide compounds and their use | [1983/10] | French: | Composés d'oxydes d'acylphosphines et leur utilisation | [1983/10] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/10] | 30.01.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.03.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0007086 (BASF AG [DE]); | [YD]EP0007508 (BASF AG [DE]) |