EP0073011 - 1-Aryloxy-3-alkinyl-amino-2-propanols and a method for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM KG Postfach 200 55216 Ingelheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM KG Postfach 200 D-55216 Ingelheim / DE | ||
Former [1983/09] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM KG ZA Patente D-6507 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Köppe, Herbert, Dr. Neuweg 72 D-6507 Ingelheim / DE | 02 /
Kummer, Werner, Dr. Georg-Scheuing-Strasse 15 D-6507 Ingelheim / DE | 03 /
Stähle, Helmut, Dr. Rotweinstrasse 23 D-6507 Ingelheim / DE | 04 /
Muacevic, Gojko, Dr. In der Dörrwiese 13 D-6507 Ingelheim / DE | 05 /
Traunecker, Werner, Dr. Birkenweg 1 D-6531 Münster-Sarmsheim / DE | [1983/09] | Application number, filing date | 82107519.9 | 18.08.1982 | [1983/09] | Priority number, date | DE19813133719 | 26.08.1981 Original published format: DE 3133719 | [1983/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0073011 | Date: | 02.03.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0073011 | Date: | 02.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07C121/80, A61K31/275, C07C120/00 | [1983/09] | CPC: |
C07C255/00 (EP,US);
C07C253/30 (KR);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/09] | Title | German: | Neue 1-Aryloxy-3-alkinylamino-2-propanole und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1983/09] | English: | 1-Aryloxy-3-alkinyl-amino-2-propanols and a method for their preparation | [1983/09] | French: | 1-Aryloxy-3-alkinylamino-2-propanols et leur méthode de préparation | [1983/09] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/21] | 22.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.08.1986 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH516511 (ICI LTD [GB]); | [Y]FR2218900 (BOEHRINGER SOHN INGELHEIM [DE]); | [Y]DE2503222 (BOEHRINGER SOHN INGELHEIM); | [YP]EP0035733 (BOEHRINGER SOHN INGELHEIM [DE]); | [YP]EP0035734 (BOEHRINGER SOHN INGELHEIM [DE]) |