Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.11.1986 [1986/45] |
20.09.1985 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.11.1985 [1985/47] |
11.08.1984 | Change - applicant | published on 17.10.1984 [1984/42] |
05.07.1984 | Change - applicant | published on 05.09.1984 [1984/36] |
09.08.1983 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.10.1983 [1983/41] |
14.01.1983 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.03.1983 [1983/11] |