Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU531552B | Global Dossier | 25.08.1983 | B2 | AU8741582 | 10.03.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | JP13541481 | 31.08.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0074013 | Global Dossier | 21.11.1985 | B1 | EP0074013 | 16.03.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP13541481 | 31.08.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3267604D1 | 02.01.1986 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP13541481 | 31.08.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6342741B | 25.08.1988 | B2 | JPS5837556 | 04.03.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | JP13541481 | 31.08.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR860000472B | 28.04.1986 | B1 | KR840001337 | 30.04.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | JP13541481 | 31.08.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4499054 | 12.02.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | JP13541481 | 31.08.1981 |