EP0073502 - Metal complexes having an antineoplastic activity, and medicaments containing these complexes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.1987 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.05.1987 [1987/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Byk Gulden Lomberg Chemische Fabrik GmbH Postfach 10 03 10 D-78403 Konstanz / DE | [1983/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keller, Heimo J. Angelweg 28 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Keppler, Bernhard Wolfgangstrasse 11 D-6900 Heidelberg-Kirchheim / DE | 03 /
Krüger, Uwe Neuhauser Strasse 11 D-7750 Konstanz / DE | 04 /
Linder, Rudolf Hermann-von-Vicaristrasse 41 D-7750 Konstanz / DE | [1983/10] | Application number, filing date | 82107914.2 | 28.08.1982 | [1983/10] | Priority number, date | DE19813134709 | 02.09.1981 Original published format: DE 3134709 | [1983/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0073502 | Date: | 09.03.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0073502 | Date: | 14.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/00, C07F7/28, A61K31/28, A61K31/74, A61K9/18 | [1983/10] | CPC: |
A61K31/28 (EP,US);
A61K31/74 (EP,US);
A61K9/145 (EP,US);
A61K9/146 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07F7/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/10] | Title | German: | Antineoplastisch wirkende Metallkomplexe und diese enthaltende Arzneimittel | [1983/10] | English: | Metal complexes having an antineoplastic activity, and medicaments containing these complexes | [1983/10] | French: | Complexes de métaux ayant une action néoplastique et médicaments les contenant | [1983/10] | Examination procedure | 28.08.1982 | Examination requested [1983/10] | 17.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3334067 (WEYENBERG DONALD R); | [X]FR2079013 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]FR2121289 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [X]GB1473335 (ICI LTD) | [XD] - JOURN. CHEM. SOC. (A) 1970, Seite 904-7, U.B. SAXENA et al.: "Reactions of Zirconium Isopropoxide with Beta-Diketones and Beta-Keto-esters". | [XD] - JOURNAL OF AMER. CHEM. SOC. Band 79, Seiten 4344-48, 1957, AKIO YAMAMOTO et al.: "Structures of the Reaction Products of Tetraalkoxytitanium with Acetylacetone and Ethyl Acetoacetate". |