EP0074590 - Preparations of optical brighteners [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.05.1988 [1988/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/12] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koll, Jochen, Ing. grad. Am Telegraf 40 D-5068 Odenthal 3 / DE | 02 /
Theidel, Hans, Dr. Tempelhoferstrasse 66 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 03 /
Mölls, Hans-Heinz, Dr. Max Beckmann Strasse 29 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | [1983/12] | Application number, filing date | 82108168.4 | 04.09.1982 | [1983/12] | Priority number, date | DE19813136809 | 16.09.1981 Original published format: DE 3136809 | [1983/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0074590 | Date: | 23.03.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0074590 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0074590 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | D06L3/12 | [1983/12] | CPC: |
D06L4/664 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1983/12] | Title | German: | Präparationen optischer Aufheller | [1983/12] | English: | Preparations of optical brighteners | [1983/12] | French: | Préparation d'azurants optiques | [1983/12] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1982 | Examination requested [1983/12] | 12.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 27.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 23.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2257945 (BASF AG); | [A]FR2243994 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]DE1921277 (DU PONT) |