EP0102409 - Method and device to check the boiling point of hygroscopic liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1987 [1987/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FAG KUGELFISCHER GEORG SCHÄFER Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Postfach 12 60 97419 Schweinfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | For all designated states FAG KUGELFISCHER GEORG SCHÄFER Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Postfach 12 60 D-97419 Schweinfurt / DE | ||
Former [1984/11] | For all designated states FAG KUGELFISCHER GEORG SCHÄFER Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Georg-Schäfer-Strasse 30 Postfach 1260 D-8720 Schweinfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spielmann, Norbert, Dipl.-Ing. Alter Hohlweg 7 D-8603 Ebern / DE | 02 /
Hager, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. Gräfenholz 6 D-8601 Rentweinsdorf / DE | 03 /
Adam, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Sandweg 1 D-8722 Obereuerheim / DE | [1984/11] | Representative(s) | Rehmann, Klaus H., et al Postfach 1260 (FAG) Hauptbahnhofstrasse D-8720 Schweinfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/11] | Rehmann, Klaus H., et al Postfach 1260 (FAG) Hauptbahnhofstrasse D-8720 Schweinfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 82108174.2 | 04.09.1982 | [1984/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0102409 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0102409 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01N25/08, H05B3/78 | [1984/11] | CPC: |
G01N25/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, LI [1984/20] |
Former [1984/11] | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Überprüfung von hygroskopischen Flüssigkeiten auf ihren Siedepunkt | [1984/11] | English: | Method and device to check the boiling point of hygroscopic liquids | [1984/11] | French: | Méthode et dispositif d'examen du point d'ébullition des liquides hygroscopiques | [1984/11] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 06.12.1983 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FR, GB, IT | 16.02.1984 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/39] | 11.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.09.1983 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 05.09.1983 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 05.09.1983 | IT   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1573278 (METTLER INSTRUMENTE AG); | [A]DE2364654 (SIGRI ELEKTROGRAPHIT GMBH); | [Y]DE2658215 (SHOWA KOGYO KK [JP], et al); | [YD]DE2721232 (EMAT AG); | [Y]DE2844513 (NORTON CO) | Examination | EP0056424 |