EP0077904 - Building material containing a polycondensation product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/18] | Polycondensation product | ||
[1987/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.1988 [1988/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika AG, vorm. Kaspar Winkler & Co. Tüffenwies 16-22 CH-8048 Zürich / CH | [1983/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bürge, Theodor Waldrütistrasse 3 CH-8954 Geroldswil / CH | 02 /
Widmer, Jürg Limmattalstrasse 3 CH-8049 Zürich / CH | 03 /
Meyer, Theodor Rosenstrasse 36 CH-8105 Regensdorf / CH | 04 /
Sulser, Ulrich Hönggerstrasse 12 CH-8102 Oberengstringen / CH | [1983/18] | Representative(s) | Blum, Rudolf Emil, et al E. BLUM & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/05] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst, et al c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 CH-8044 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1983/18] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst c/o E. BLUM & CO. Vorderberg 11 CH-8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 82108240.1 | 08.09.1982 | [1983/18] | Priority number, date | CH19810006821 | 26.10.1981 Original published format: CH 682181 | [1983/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0077904 | Date: | 04.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0077904 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C04B24/28 | [1987/32] | CPC: |
C04B24/20 (EP,US);
C04B24/16 (EP,US);
C04B24/30 (EP,US);
C08G12/02 (EP,US);
C08G14/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/18] | C08G12/02, C08G14/06, C04B13/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/18] | Title | German: | Baustoffe,enthaltend ein Polykondensationsprodukt | [1987/32] | English: | Building material containing a polycondensation product | [1987/32] | French: | Matériaux de construction contenant un produit de polycondensation | [1987/32] |
Former [1983/18] | Polykondensationsprodukt | ||
Former [1983/18] | Polycondensation product | ||
Former [1983/18] | Produit de polycondensation | Examination procedure | 09.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/38] | 03.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP51139823 ; | [X]FR2150493 (CASSELLA FARBWERKE MAINKUR AG); | [X]FR2287459 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH [DE]); | [X]FR2386568 (CASSELLA FARBWERKE MAINKUR AG [DE]); | [E]EP0059353 (SIKA AG [CH]); | [E]DE3107853 (SIKA AG [CH]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 86, 1977, Seite 336, Nr. 77721u, Columbus, Ohio, USA & JP-A-51 139 823 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD.) 02.12.1976, & JP51139823 A 00000000 |